Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Malachy O’Moloney

Deceased

Bishop of Kilmacduagh, Ireland


Events

DateEventTitle
10 Jan 1571AppointedBishop of Killaloe, Ireland
11 Feb 1571Ordained BishopBishop of Killaloe, Ireland
22 Aug 1576AppointedBishop of Kilmacduagh, Ireland
1610¹DiedBishop of Kilmacduagh, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Malachy O’Moloney
Bishop Malachy O’Moloney (died 1610) Bishop of Kilmacduagh

EventPlace
Ordained BishopApostolic Palace, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 38.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 219, and Page 188
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 18, Number 70
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1571, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018