Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gregorio Forbicini

Deceased

Bishop of Strongoli, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
23 Jan 1572AppointedBishop of Strongoli, Italy
27 Jan 1572Ordained BishopBishop of Strongoli, Italy
1579²DiedBishop of Strongoli, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gregorio Forbicini
Bishop Gregorio Forbicini (died 1579) Bishop of Strongoli

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 6.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 305
  • ob/c2+: CB, 29 Sep 2011
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1572, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018