Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Guillaume de Berghes

Deceased

Archbishop of Cambrai, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1551¹Born
14 Apr 159746.2AppointedBishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers}, Belgium
29 Mar 159847.2Ordained BishopBishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers}, Belgium
9 Apr 160150.2AppointedArchbishop of Cambrai, France
30 Dec 160150.9InstalledArchbishop of Cambrai, France
27 Apr 160958.3DiedArchbishop of Cambrai, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Guillaume de Berghes
Archbishop Guillaume de Berghes (born 1551, died ) Archbishop of Cambrai

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAnvers, Diocese of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers}, Belgium
Ordained BishopCathedral, Anvers, Diocese of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers}, Belgium
Death PlaceCambrai, Archdiocese of Cambrai

  • a bishop for 11.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 87, and Page 131
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1598, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast