Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan van Strijen

Deceased

Bishop of Middelburg, Netherlands


Events

DateEventTitle
4 Jun 1576AppointedBishop of Middelburg, Netherlands
15 Aug 1581Ordained BishopBishop of Middelburg, Netherlands
8 Jul 1594DiedBishop of Middelburg, Netherlands

MicroData Summary for Jan van Strijen
Bishop Jan van Strijen (died ) Bishop of Middelburg

EventPlace
Ordained BishopCordeliers, Namur, Diocese of Namur {Namen}, Belgium
Death PlaceLouvain

  • a bishop for 12.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 243
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1581, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast