Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François de Wallon-Capelle, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1525¹Born
11 Jan 158055.0AppointedBishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium
10 Apr 158055.2Ordained BishopBishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium
17 Feb 159267.1DiedBishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for François de Wallon-Capelle
Bishop François de Wallon-Capelle O.F.M. (born 1525, died ) Bishop of Namur {Namen}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint Omer
Ordained BishopFranciscan, Church, Namur, Diocese of Namur {Namen}
Death PlaceNamur, Diocese of Namur {Namen}

  • a bishop for 11.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: CB, 18 Nov 2015
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1580, Number 6
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 252

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018