Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Maximilien de Berghes

Deceased

Archbishop of Cambrai, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1518¹Born
10 Sep 155638.6SelectedBishop of Cambrai, France
23 Dec 155840.9ConfirmedBishop of Cambrai, France
12 May 155941.3AppointedArchbishop of Cambrai, France
14 May 155941.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Cambrai, France
29 Aug 157052.6DiedArchbishop of Cambrai, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Maximilien de Berghes (VIAF: 283325768)
Archbishop Maximilien de Berghes (born 1518, died ) Archbishop of Cambrai

  • a bishop for 11.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 149
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,559, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast