Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Remigius (Remi) Driutius (Drieux)

Deceased

Bishop of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1519¹Born
154324.0Ordained PriestPriest
8 Aug 156142.6AppointedBishop of Leeuwarden, Netherlands
16 Sep 156950.7AppointedBishop of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium
13 Nov 156950.8Ordained BishopBishop of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium
12 May 159475.3DiedBishop of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Remigius (Remi) Driutius (Drieux) (VIAF: 221157624)
Bishop Remigius (Remi) Driutius (Drieux) (born 1519, died ) Bishop of Brugge {Bruges}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVolkerinkhove/Merckeghem
Ordained BishopSte Catherine, Malines
Death PlaceBruges, Diocese of Brugge {Bruges}

  • a priest for 51.3 years
  • a bishop for 24.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 223, and Page 141
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1569, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast