Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Vischer

Deceased

Bishop of Ypres (Ieper)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1561¹BornBergues
25 Oct 161049.8AppointedBishop of Ypres (Ieper), Belgium
6 Feb 161150.0Ordained BishopBishop of Ypres (Ieper), Belgium
26 May 161352.4DiedBishop of Ypres (Ieper), Belgium

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean Vischer:
Bishop Jean Vischer (died ) Bishop of Ypres (Ieper)

  • a bishop for 2.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 374
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1611, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 10 Feb 2015