Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolao Gaetano Aprosio, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nebbio, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Aug 1662³Born
23 Sep 168422.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Congregation of Clerics Regular
21 Sep 168624.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Clerics Regular
11 Dec 171351.3AppointedBishop of Nebbio, France
28 Jan 171451.4Ordained BishopBishop of Nebbio, France
19 Dec 173270.3DiedBishop of Nebbio, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nicolao Gaetano Aprosio
Bishop Nicolao Gaetano Aprosio C.R. (born , died ) Bishop of Nebbio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVentimiglia, Diocese of Ventimiglia, Italy

  • a priest for 46.2 years
  • a bishop for 18.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 283
  • ob/c2+: AT, 23 May 2015
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1714, Number 1
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Number 18,442

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast