Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Humbertus Guilielmus de Precipiano

Deceased

Archbishop of Mechelen


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Sep 1627BornRougemont, France
27 Mar 166133.5Ordained PriestPriest
7 Dec 168255.2AppointedBishop of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium
21 Mar 168355.5Ordained BishopBishop of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium
12 Jul 168961.8SelectedArchbishop of Mechelen, Belgium
8 May 169062.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Mechelen, Belgium
9 Jun 171183.7DiedArchbishop of Mechelen, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Humbertus Guilielmus de Precipiano:
Archbishop Humbertus Guilielmus de Precipiano (born , died ) Archbishop of Mechelen

  • a priest for 50.2 years
  • a bishop for 28.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 128, and Page 262

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 23 Sep 2014