Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Réginald Cools, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jan 1618BornAntwerpen
12 Sep 164628.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
16 Nov 167658.8AppointedBishop of Roermond, Netherlands
17 Jan 167758.9Ordained BishopBishop of Roermond, Netherlands
10 May 170082.2AppointedBishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers}, Belgium
2 Dec 170688.8DiedBishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Réginald Cools:
Bishop Réginald Cools O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers}

  • a priest for 60.2 years
  • a bishop for 29.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 90, and Page 337
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1677, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 30 Apr 2015