Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guilelmus Herincx, O.F.M. Rec. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ypres (Ieper), Belgium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Oct 1621Born
24 Sep 164422.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Recollect
13 Sep 167755.9AppointedBishop of Ypres (Ieper), Belgium
24 Oct 167756.0Ordained BishopBishop of Ypres (Ieper), Belgium
17 Aug 167856.8DiedBishop of Ypres (Ieper), Belgium

MicroData Summary for Guilelmus Herincx
Bishop Guilelmus Herincx O.F.M. Rec. (born , died ) Bishop of Ypres (Ieper)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHelmond

  • a priest for 33.8 years
  • a bishop for .8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 420
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1677, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018