Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Gianantonio Cardinal Davia

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Rimini

Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina

Prefect of the Congregation of the Index


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Oct 1660BornBologna
18 Jul 168726.7AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Belgium
21 Jun 169029.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Thebae
7 Jul 169029.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Germany
10 Sep 169029.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Thebae
11 Oct 169029.9ResignedApostolic Internuncio to Belgium
3 Mar 169635.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Poland
24 Apr 169635.5ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Germany
10 Mar 169837.4AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Rimini, Italy
22 May 170039.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Emperor
Jul 1700³39.7ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Poland
Feb 1706³45.3ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Emperor
18 May 171251.5Elevated to Cardinal
30 Aug 171352.8InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Callisto
19 Nov 172565.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli
7 Dec 172666.1ResignedBishop of Rimini, Italy
Sep 1727³66.8AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of the Index
11 Feb 173776.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina
11 Jan 174079.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Rimini, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gianantonio Davia (VIAF: 31954325)
Gianantonio Cardinal Davia (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Rimini

  • a bishop for 49.3 years
  • a cardinal for 27.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 May 1712
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1690, Number 27
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 241

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 7 Nov 2016