Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fulvio Salvi

Deceased

Bishop of Sovana (Soana)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Jul 1658BornSenen
4 Jul 168325.0Ordained PriestPriest
11 Dec 171355.4AppointedBishop of Sovana (Soana), Italy
21 Dec 171355.5Ordained BishopBishop of Sovana (Soana), Italy
23 May 172768.9DiedBishop of Sovana (Soana), Italy

MicroData Summary for Fulvio Salvi:
Bishop Fulvio Salvi (died ) Bishop of Sovana (Soana)

  • a priest for 43.9 years
  • a bishop for 13.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 365

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013