Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Dłużewski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Chełm, Poland

Titular Bishop of Gratianopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Jan 1658³Born
18 Jun 169638.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chełm, Poland
18 Jun 169638.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Gratianopolis
23 Sep 1696³38.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gratianopolis
13 Apr 172062.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Chełm, Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Jan Dłużewski
Bishop Jan Dłużewski (born Jan 1658, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Chełm

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOstrowicz

  • a bishop for 23.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 212
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1696, Number 41
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Number 18,421

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast