Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Teodor Andrzej Potocki

Deceased

Archbishop of Gniezno


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Feb 1664BornMoscow
Nov 168824.7Ordained PriestPriest
11 Apr 169935.1AppointedBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
31 May 169935.2Ordained BishopBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
30 Jul 171147.4SelectedBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
1 Jun 171248.3ConfirmedBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
26 Sep 171248.6InstalledBishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
9 Jan 172358.9SelectedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland
22 Nov 172359.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland
12 Nov 173874.7DiedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland

MicroData Summary for Teodor Andrzej Potocki:
Archbishop Teodor Andrzej Potocki (born , died ) Archbishop of Gniezno

  • a priest for 50.0 years
  • a bishop for 39.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bisch÷fe des Heiligen R÷mischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 178, and Page 210
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 405
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206, Number 17,015
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1699, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.8, 27 Jul 2015; Data: 1 Aug 2015