Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Mikolaj (Damascene) Łubieniecki, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Bacău


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Oct 1652³BornPrzybyszeniez
21 Sep 167522.9Ordained PriestPriest
23 Feb 171158.3AppointedBishop of Bacău, Romania
12 Jul 171158.7Ordained BishopBishop of Bacău, Romania
1714²61.2DiedBishop of Bacău, Romania

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jan Mikolaj (Damascene) Łubieniecki:
Bishop Jan Mikolaj (Damascene) Łubieniecki O.P. (born , died 1714) Bishop of Bacău

  • a priest for 38.2 years
  • a bishop for 2.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 111
  • ob/c2+: CB, 15 Sep 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1711, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 30 Jun 2015