Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stefan Bogusław Rupniewski

Deceased

Bishop of Lutsk (Łuck)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1670¹BornKraków
2 Feb 169828.0Ordained PriestPriest
22 May 171343.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lviv, Ukraine
22 May 171343.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Lycopolis
9 Jul 171343.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lycopolis
23 Dec 171646.9AppointedBishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec), Ukraine
1 Dec 172151.9AppointedBishop of Lutsk (Łuck), Ukraine
21 Apr 173161.3DiedBishop of Lutsk (Łuck), Ukraine

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Stefan Bogusław Rupniewski:
Bishop Stefan Bogusław Rupniewski (born 1670, died ) Bishop of Lutsk (Łuck)

  • a priest for 33.2 years
  • a bishop for 17.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 138, and Page 248
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 250
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Number 14,752
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1713, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015