Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jerzy Albrecht Denhoff

Deceased

Bishop of Kraków


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Apr 1640³Born
1 Apr 168645.9AppointedBishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec), Ukraine
19 Oct 168949.5AppointedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
9 May 170161.0AppointedBishop of Kraków, Poland
16 Mar 170261.9DiedBishop of Kraków, Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jerzy Albrecht Denhoff:
Bishop Jerzy Albrecht Denhoff (born , died ) Bishop of Kraków

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 138, and Page 175
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 324
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1686, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 6 May 2015