Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Kazimierz Łubieński

Deceased

Bishop of Kraków


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1652Born
3 Jan 170149.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kraków, Poland
3 Jan 170149.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Heraclea in Europa
6 Mar 170149.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Heraclea in Europa
14 Dec 170553.9AppointedBishop of Chełm, Poland
7 May 171058.3AppointedBishop of Kraków, Poland
2 May 171967.3DiedBishop of Kraków, Poland

MicroData Summary for Kazimierz Łubieński:
Bishop Kazimierz Łubieński (born 1652, died ) Bishop of Kraków

  • a bishop for 18.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,639
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1701, Number 6
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 156, and Page 175
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 218

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 20 Jun 2015