Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Chryzostom Benedykt Gniński, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Bishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Aug 1648³BornPoznań
17 Nov 167527.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Cistercians
25 Mar 167627.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Cistercians
28 May 170051.8AppointedBishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec), Ukraine
10 Aug 171668.0DiedBishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec), Ukraine

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Chryzostom Benedykt Gniński:
Bishop Chryzostom Benedykt Gniński O. Cist. (born , died ) Bishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec)

  • a priest for 40.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 138
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1700, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 5 May 2015