Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franciszek Mikołaj Prażmowski

Deceased

Bishop of Lutsk (Łuck), Ukraine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1646¹Born
21 May 166216.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
28 May 166216.4Ordained PriestPriest
1692¹46.0SelectedBishop of Lutsk (Łuck), Ukraine
24 Sep 169650.7ConfirmedBishop of Lutsk (Łuck), Ukraine
10 Feb 169751.1Ordained BishopBishop of Lutsk (Łuck), Ukraine
3 Sep 1701³55.6DiedBishop of Lutsk (Łuck), Ukraine

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Franciszek Mikołaj Prażmowski
Bishop Franciszek Mikołaj Prażmowski (born 1646, died ) Bishop of Lutsk (Łuck)

EventPlace
Birth PlacePrazmow

  • a priest for 39.2 years
  • a bishop for 4.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 248
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1697, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast