Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Seweryn Szczuka

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm)

Titular Bishop of Ioppe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Oct 1651³BornBiałaszewo
20 Dec 168231.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
11 Jan 168331.2Ordained PriestPriest of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
26 Nov 170352.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
26 Nov 170352.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Ioppe
22 Mar 170553.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ioppe
11 Dec 172776.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Seweryn Szczuka:
Bishop Seweryn Szczuka (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm)

  • a priest for 44.9 years
  • a bishop for 22.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bisch÷fe des Heiligen R÷mischen Reiches
  • b/ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 207, Number 17,100
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1705, Number 4
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 229

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 30 Jun 2015