Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Krzysztof Michal Dobiński

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Gniezno

Titular Bishop of Serra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 May 1695³BornProszowice
24 Jun 172025.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
14 Jul 172025.1Ordained PriestPriest
27 Jun 173843.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Gniezno, Poland
27 Jun 173843.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Serra
31 Aug 173843.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Serra
21 Jul 176974.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Gniezno, Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Krzysztof Michal Dobiński:
Bishop Krzysztof Michal Dobiński (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Gniezno

  • a priest for 49.0 years
  • a bishop for 30.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 185, Number 15,120
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 180, Number 14,861
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1738, Number 39
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 377, and Page 454

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 16 Nov 2015