Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michał Ignacy Kunicki

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Kraków

Titular Bishop of Arsinoë in Arcadia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Oct 1698³BornCzulczyce
12 Oct 172123.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
19 Oct 172123.0Ordained PriestPriest
23 Dec 172628.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kraków, Poland
23 Dec 172628.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Arsinoë in Arcadia
23 Mar 172728.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arsinoë in Arcadia
9 Nov 175153.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Kraków, Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michał Ignacy Kunicki:
Bishop Michał Ignacy Kunicki (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Kraków

  • a priest for 30.0 years
  • a bishop for 24.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 180, Number 14,860
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,645
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1727, Number 41
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 99

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015