Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franciszek Antoni Kobielski

Deceased

Bishop of Lutsk (Łuck)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Oct 1679BornDmenin
3 Apr 170626.4Ordained PriestPriest
23 Jul 172545.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
23 Jul 172545.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Antaeopolis
19 Nov 173657.0AppointedBishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec), Ukraine
30 Sep 173959.9AppointedBishop of Lutsk (Łuck), Ukraine
17 Jan 175575.2DiedBishop of Lutsk (Łuck), Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Franciszek Antoni Kobielski:
Bishop Franciszek Antoni Kobielski (born , died ) Bishop of Lutsk (Łuck)

  • a priest for 48.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 89
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Number 14,757
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,033
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 218, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 3 May 2015