Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Chryzostom Krasiński

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Chełm

Titular Bishop of Loryma


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jan 1695BornRustelniciz
7 Jun 172126.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
20 Sep 172126.6Ordained PriestPriest
16 Sep 174853.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chełm, Poland
16 Sep 174853.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Loryma
3 Nov 174853.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Loryma
25 Mar 175762.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Chełm, Poland

MicroData Summary for Jan Chryzostom Krasiński:
Bishop Jan Chryzostom Krasiński (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Chełm

  • a priest for 35.5 years
  • a bishop for 8.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 265, and Page 453
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1748, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 16 Nov 2015