Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Kajetan Ignacy Sołtyk

Deceased

Bishop of Kraków


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Aug 1715³BornKrakow
20 Jul 173822.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
3 Aug 173823.0Ordained PriestPriest
18 Aug 174833.0SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Kyiv and Chernihiv (Kijów and Czernihow), Ukraine
22 Sep 174934.1ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Kyiv and Chernihiv (Kijów and Czernihow), Ukraine
22 Sep 174934.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Emmaüs
9 Nov 174934.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Emmaüs
19 Apr 175640.7SucceededBishop of Kyiv and Chernihiv (Kijów and Czernihow), Ukraine
19 Dec 175843.3SelectedBishop of Kraków, Poland
12 Feb 175943.5ConfirmedBishop of Kraków, Poland
30 Jul 178872.9DiedBishop of Kraków, Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Kajetan Ignacy Sołtyk:
Bishop Kajetan Ignacy Sołtyk (born , died ) Bishop of Kraków

  • a priest for 49.9 years
  • a bishop for 38.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 185, and Page 208
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 248
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,647
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1749, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 11 Dec 2015