Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fabian Franziszek Pląskowski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland

Titular Bishop of Martyropolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Feb 1705³Born
Jan 1728³22.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
7 Feb 172823.0Ordained PriestPriest of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
25 May 175045.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
25 May 175045.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Martyropolis
9 Aug 175045.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Martyropolis
18 Feb 178479.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Fabian Franziszek Pląskowski
Bishop Fabian Franziszek Pląskowski (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNiezywiec

  • a priest for 56.0 years
  • a bishop for 33.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bisch÷fe des Heiligen R÷mischen Reiches
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1750, Number 15
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 279, and Page 454

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018