Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Karl Friedrich von Zehmen

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Warmia (Ermland)

Titular Bishop of Lete


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Apr 1720³BornAurach
12 May 174323.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Eichstätt, Germany
8 Jun 174323.1Ordained PriestPriest of Eichstätt, Germany
22 Apr 176545.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland
22 Apr 176545.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Lete
8 Sep 176545.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lete
13 Dec 179878.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Warmia (Ermland), Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Karl Friedrich von Zehmen:
Bishop Karl Friedrich von Zehmen (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Warmia (Ermland)

  • a priest for 55.5 years
  • a bishop for 33.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1765, Number 28
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 260, and Page 454

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 27 Dec 2015