Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoni Sebastian Dembowski

Deceased

Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1682³Born
3 Jan 173653.9SelectedBishop of Płock, Poland
11 Apr 173654.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
15 Apr 173654.2Ordained PriestPriest
6 May 173755.2ConfirmedBishop of Płock, Poland
9 Jun 173755.3Ordained BishopBishop of Płock, Poland
7 Jun 175270.3SelectedBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
18 Dec 175270.8ConfirmedBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
17 Sep 176381.6DiedBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antoni Sebastian Dembowski:
Bishop Antoni Sebastian Dembowski (born , died ) Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze)

  • a priest for 27.4 years
  • a bishop for 26.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 189, Number 15,384
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 342, and Page 444
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1737, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 23 Nov 2015