Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jerzy Mikołaj Hylzen

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Smoleńsk, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Dec 1696³Born
3 Sep 174447.7SelectedBishop of Smoleńsk, Poland
10 May 174548.4ConfirmedBishop of Smoleńsk, Poland
13 Feb 174649.1Ordained BishopBishop of Smoleńsk, Poland
29 Jan 176366.1ResignedBishop of Smoleńsk, Poland
24 Apr 177578.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Smoleńsk, Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jerzy Mikołaj Hylzen
Bishop Jerzy Mikołaj Hylzen (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Smoleńsk

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBoessowicz

  • a bishop for 29.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 382
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1746, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018