Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Stanislaw Jan Siestrzencewicz Bohusz

Deceased

Archbishop of Mohilev


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Sep 1731BornZanki k. Wylkowyszek
12 Jun 176331.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Vilnius, Lithuania
3 Jul 176331.8Ordained PriestPriest of Vilnius, Lithuania
12 Jul 177341.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
12 Jul 177341.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Mallus
3 Oct 177342.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mallus
11 Dec 178352.2AppointedArchbishop of Mohilev, Belarus
1 Dec 182695.2DiedArchbishop of Mohilev, Belarus

MicroData Summary for Stanislaw Jan Siestrzencewicz Bohusz:
Archbishop Stanislaw Jan Siestrzencewicz Bohusz (born , died ) Archbishop of Mohilev

  • a priest for 63.4 years
  • a bishop for 53.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 186, Number 15,190
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 274, and Page 293
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1773, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 3 Jan 2016