Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Iraklij (Herakliusz) Listovskyj (Lissowski), O.S.B.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian)

Archbishop of Połock (Polotsk) (Ukrainian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1734¹BornUsac
1783²49.0AppointedArchbishop of Połock (Polotsk) (Ukrainian), Belarus
18 Apr 178450.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Połock (Polotsk) (Ukrainian), Belarus
1805²71.0AppointedAdministrator of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine
24 Jul 180672.5AppointedArchbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine
30 Aug 180975.6DiedArchbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Iraklij (Herakliusz) Listovskyj (Lissowski):
Archbishop Iraklij (Herakliusz) Listovskyj (Lissowski) O.S.B.M. (born 1734, died ) Archbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev}

  • a bishop for 25.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Number 14,764
  • b: Hierarchy of the Kyivan Church 861-1990, Page 256, and Page 284
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,906
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1784, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 3 Jan 2016