Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archeparchy of Lviv (Ukrainian)

Leopolitanus Ucrainorum



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Eparchy of Lviv (Ukrainian)
1677ErectedEparchy of Lviv (Ukrainian) (erected)
Archeparchy of Lviv (Ukrainian)
22 February 1807ElevatedEparchy of Lviv (Ukrainian) Archeparchy of Lviv (Ukrainian)
26 September 1808ElevatedArcheparchy of Lviv (Ukrainian) (became a Metropolitan)
23 December 1963ElevatedArcheparchy of Lviv (Ukrainian) (became a Major Archdiocese)
20 April 1993Territory LostArcheparchy of Lviv (Ukrainian) Eparchy of Sambir-Drohobych (Ukrainian) (erected)
20 April 1993Territory LostArcheparchy of Lviv (Ukrainian) Eparchy of Ternopil (Ukrainian) (erected)
20 April 1993Territory LostArcheparchy of Lviv (Ukrainian) Eparchy of Zboriv (Ukrainian) (erected)
25 November 1995Territory LostArcheparchy of Lviv (Ukrainian) Archiepiscopal Exarchate of Kyiv-Vyshhorod (Ukrainian) (erected)
21 July 2000Territory LostArcheparchy of Lviv (Ukrainian)
Eparchy of Ternopil (Ukrainian)
Eparchy of Sokal (Ukrainian) (erected)
21 July 2000Territory LostArcheparchy of Lviv (Ukrainian) Eparchy of Stryj (Ukrainian) (erected)
6 December 2004ElevatedArcheparchy of Lviv (Ukrainian) (no longer a Metropolitan)
29 August 2005ElevatedArcheparchy of Lviv (Ukrainian) (no longer a Major Archdiocese)
21 November 2011ElevatedArcheparchy of Lviv (Ukrainian) (became a Metropolitan)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archeparchy of Lviv (Ukrainian)
19431,300,0001,0041,0041,2941,267ap1981
19971,607,0001,826,70088.0%483725552,8952485381736ap2000
2000857,0531,783,40048.1%251342853,0072204291434ap2001
2001650,0001,122,70057.9%262543162,0562202193264ap2002
2002655,0001,120,00058.5%273563291,9902185210272ap2003
2003650,0001,068,20960.8%271583291,9752131208271ap2004
2009755,8211,068,40070.7%319803991,8944363277277ap2010

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 5 Apr 2014