Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Eparchy of Sokal-Zhovkva (Ukrainian)

Eparchia Socaliensis-Zhovkviesis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Mychajlo Koltun, C.SS.R., Bishop

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Eparchy of Sokal (Ukrainian)
21 July 2000ErectedArcheparchy of Lviv (Ukrainian)
Eparchy of Ternopil (Ukrainian)
Eparchy of Sokal (Ukrainian) (erected)
Eparchy of Sokal-Zhovkva (Ukrainian)
20 September 2006Name ChangedEparchy of Sokal (Ukrainian) Eparchy of Sokal-Zhovkva (Ukrainian)
21 November 2011Metropolitan ChangedEparchy of Sokal-Zhovkva (Ukrainian) (from Kyiv)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Eparchy of Sokal (Ukrainian)
2000342,709531,70064.5%167271941,76627322ap2001
2001343,000532,00064.5%172322041,6815060322ap2002
2002343,168530,78064.7%177292061,6654751352ap2003
2003332,644529,32862.8%180332131,5614962352ap2004
Eparchy of Sokal-Zhovkva (Ukrainian)
2007327,218519,37063.0%227282551,2835642354ap2008
2009323,838510,92563.4%225292541,2747327355ap2010
2010321,645491,75165.4%227302571,2517029355ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 5 Apr 2014