Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vasyl Ivasyuk

Bishop of Kolomyia-Chernivtsi (Ukrainian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jan 1960 BornDora
16 Aug 198929.6Ordained PriestPriest of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
20 Apr 199333.2IncardinatedPriest of Zboriv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
21 Jul 200040.5IncardinatedPriest of Sokal (Ukrainian), Ukraine
28 Jul 200343.5AppointedArchiepiscopal Exarch of Odessa-Krym (Ukrainian), Ukraine
28 Jul 200343.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Benda
28 Sep 200343.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Benda
13 Feb 201454.1AppointedBishop of Kolomyia-Chernivtsi (Ukrainian), Ukraine
22 Mar 201454.2InstalledBishop of Kolomyia-Chernivtsi (Ukrainian), Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Vasyl Ivasyuk:
Bishop Vasyl Ivasyuk (born ) Bishop of Kolomyia-Chernivtsi

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Kolomyia-Chernivtsi (Ukrainian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Number 14,468
  • ab: Bollettino, 13 Feb 2014
  • i: CB, 15 Feb 2014
  • opd/in: CB, 4 Apr 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 5 Apr 2014