Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Kyprian Żochowski (Zhokhovskyj)

Deceased

Archbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian)

Archbishop of Połock (Polotsk) (Ukrainian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1635¹Born
29 Apr 166328.3Ordained PriestPriest
1670²35.0AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Połock (Polotsk) (Ukrainian), Belarus
12 Nov 167035.8SelectedCoadjutor Archbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine
15 Mar 167136.2Ordained BishopCoadjutor Archbishop of Połock (Polotsk) (Ukrainian), Belarus
1 Jun 167136.4ConfirmedCoadjutor Archbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine
21 May 167439.3SucceededArchbishop of Połock (Polotsk) (Ukrainian), Belarus
21 May 167439.3SucceededArchbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine
26 Oct 169358.8DiedArchbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Kyprian Żochowski (Zhokhovskyj):
Archbishop Kyprian Żochowski (Zhokhovskyj) (born 1635, died ) Archbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev}

  • a priest for 30.4 years
  • a bishop for 22.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 233
  • b: Hierarchy of the Kyivan Church 861-1990, Page 251, and Page 282
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations piscopales, Year 1671, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 20 Jun 2015