Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Josyf Veliamyn Rutski

Deceased

Archbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian)

Note/Previous Titular See: (Halicz / Ruthenian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1574¹Born
16 Nov 161137.8SelectedCoadjutor Archbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine
Jun 1613³39.4Ordained BishopCoadjutor Archbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine
8 Aug 161339.6SucceededArchbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine
5 Apr 161440.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine
1626²52.0AppointedAdministrator of Chełm (Ukrainian), Poland
1630²56.0ResignedAdministrator of Chełm (Ukrainian), Poland
1631²57.0AppointedAdministrator of Volodymyr (Włodzimierz) et Brėst (Ukrainian)
1632²58.0ResignedAdministrator of Volodymyr (Włodzimierz) et Brėst (Ukrainian)
5 Feb 163763.0DiedArchbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Josyf Veliamyn Rutski:
Archbishop Josyf Veliamyn Rutski (died ) Archbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev}

  • a bishop for 23.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 149
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1613, Number 12
  • b: Hierarchy of the Kyivan Church 861-1990, Page 249, and Page 268, and Page 296
  • b: Hierarchy of the Kyivan Church 861-1990, Page 301

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 16 Feb 2015