Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop St. Jozafat Kuncewicz, O.S.B.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Połock (Polotsk) (Ukrainian), Belarus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1580¹Born
160929.0Ordained PriestPriest
28 Jun 161737.4SelectedCoadjutor Archbishop of Połock (Polotsk) (Ukrainian), Belarus
12 Nov 161737.8Ordained BishopCoadjutor Archbishop of Połock (Polotsk) (Ukrainian), Belarus
31 Mar 161838.2SucceededArchbishop of Połock (Polotsk) (Ukrainian), Belarus
12 Nov 162343.8DiedArchbishop of Połock (Polotsk) (Ukrainian), Belarus
16 May 1643Beatified
29 Jun 1867Canonized

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for St. Jozafat Kuncewicz
Archbishop St. Jozafat Kuncewicz O.S.B.M. (born 1580, died ) Archbishop of Połock (Polotsk)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWłodzimierzu Wołyńskim

  • a priest for 14.8 years
  • a bishop for 6.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 188, Number 15,305
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1617, Number 25
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 203
  • b: Hierarchy of the Kyivan Church 861-1990, Page 281

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast