Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Hipacy (Ipatij) Pociej (Potij)

Deceased

Archbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Aug 1541BornRozanka, Poland
Mar 1593³51.5Ordained PriestPriest
4 Mar 159351.5AppointedBishop
31 Mar 159351.6Ordained BishopBishop
19 Oct 159655.1ConvertedBishop of Volodymyr (Włodzimierz) et Brėst (Ukrainian)
26 Sep 159958.1SelectedArchbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine
15 Nov 160059.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine
13 Jul 161371.9DiedArchbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Hipacy (Ipatij) Pociej (Potij):
Archbishop Hipacy (Ipatij) Pociej (Potij) (born , died ) Archbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev}

  • a priest for 20.3 years
  • a bishop for 20.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 149
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 213, Number 17,631
  • b: Hierarchy of the Kyivan Church 861-1990, Page 248, and Page 295
  • bd/op/conv/c2: CB, 19 Jun 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 29 Jun 2015