Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Rafał Mikołaj Korsak

Deceased

Coadjutor Archbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian)

Note/Previous Titular See: Halyc


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1600¹Born
8 Jul 162626.5SelectedCoadjutor Archbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine
6 Sep 162626.6Ordained BishopCoadjutor Archbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine
9 Mar 163131.1ConfirmedCoadjutor Archbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine
19 Apr 163232.2SelectedBishop of Pińsk-Turaŭ (Ukrainian), Belarus
5 Feb 163737.0SucceededArchbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine
Dec 1640³40.9DiedArchbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Rafał Mikołaj Korsak:
Archbishop Rafał Mikołaj Korsak (born 1600, died Dec 1640) Coadjutor Archbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev}

  • a bishop for 14.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Number 15,445
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 150
  • b: Hierarchy of the Kyivan Church 861-1990, Page 268, and Page 276
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1626, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015