Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Kazimieras (Kazimierz) Pacas (Pac)

Deceased

Bishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź)


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Jan 1664AppointedBishop of Smoleńsk, Poland
15 Jun 1664Ordained BishopBishop of Smoleńsk, Poland
3 Oct 1667AppointedBishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania
1695¹DiedBishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź), Lithuania

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Kazimieras (Kazimierz) Pacas (Pac):
Bishop Kazimieras (Kazimierz) Pacas (Pac) , Bishop of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź)

  • a bishop for 30.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 342
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 318
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1664, Number 9
  • c5: CB, 6 Apr 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 6 Apr 2015