Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jerzy Białłozor

Deceased

Bishop of Vilnius, Lithuania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1620¹Born
18 Mar 165838.2AppointedBishop of Smoleńsk, Poland
21 Nov 166141.8AppointedBishop of Vilnius, Lithuania
17 May 166545.3DiedBishop of Vilnius, Lithuania

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jerzy Białłozor
Bishop Jerzy Białłozor (born 1620, died ) Bishop of Vilnius

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGnykyski

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 318, and Page 370
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1658, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast