Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ioan Inocențiu Klein (Micu), O.S.B.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Făgăraş (Romanian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1692¹BornTransilvania
12 Jul 172937.5SelectedBishop of Făgăraş (Romanian), Romania
23 Sep 172937.7Ordained PriestPriest of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
11 Sep 173038.7ConfirmedBishop of Făgăraş (Romanian), Romania
5 Nov 173038.8Ordained BishopBishop of Făgăraş (Romanian), Romania
28 Sep 173240.7InstalledBishop of Făgăraş (Romanian), Romania
7 May 175159.3ResignedBishop of Făgăraş (Romanian), Romania
22 Sep 176876.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Făgăraş (Romanian), Romania

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ioan Inocențiu Klein (Micu):
Bishop Ioan Inocențiu Klein (Micu) O.S.B.M. (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Făgăraş

  • a priest for 39.0 years
  • a bishop for 37.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 217

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013