Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Yuriy Havryil Vynnytskyi (Winnicki), O.S.B.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian)

Bishop of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ukrainian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jul 1660BornPrzemsyl
1691²30.4Converted
12 Apr 170039.7SelectedBishop of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ukrainian), Poland
20 Apr 170039.7ProfessedMember of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
2 May 170039.7Ordained PriestPriest of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
5 Jun 170039.8ConfirmedBishop of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ukrainian), Poland
6 Jun 170039.8Ordained BishopBishop of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ukrainian), Poland
1707²46.4AppointedAdministrator of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine
14 Aug 170848.0AppointedAdministrator of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine
14 Aug 170848.0AppointedAdministrator of Volodymyr (Włodzimierz) et Brėst (Ukrainian)
28 Aug 170848.0AppointedAdministrator of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
1710²49.4ResignedAdministrator of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine
1710²49.4ResignedAdministrator of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
7 May 171049.7AppointedArchbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine
1711²50.4ResignedAdministrator of Volodymyr (Włodzimierz) et Brėst (Ukrainian)
22 Sep 171353.1DiedArchbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Yuriy Havryil Vynnytskyi (Winnicki):
Archbishop Yuriy Havryil Vynnytskyi (Winnicki) O.S.B.M. (born , died ) Archbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev}

  • a priest for 13.3 years
  • a bishop for 13.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 233
  • b: Hierarchy of the Kyivan Church 861-1990, Page 252, and Page 269, and Page 273
  • b: Hierarchy of the Kyivan Church 861-1990, Page 297
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1700, Number 36
  • bp/bd/prof/op: CB, 14 Sep 2015
  • bd/op/sele/c1: CB, 11 Oct 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015