Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vasyl Varlam Šeptycki (Sheptyskyi)

Deceased

Bishop of Lviv (Ukrainian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Feb 1647BornVoshchatychi
26 Feb 166821.0Ordained PriestPriest
7 Mar 167730.0Converted
30 Oct 170962.7SelectedBishop of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
21 Jan 171062.9ConfirmedBishop of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
15 Jun 171063.3Ordained BishopBishop of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
5 Apr 171568.1DiedBishop of Lviv (Ukrainian), Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Vasyl Varlam Šeptycki (Sheptyskyi):
Bishop Vasyl Varlam Šeptycki (Sheptyskyi) (born , died ) Bishop of Lviv

  • a priest for 47.1 years
  • a bishop for 4.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Number 15,532
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 215, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchy of the Kyivan Church 861-1990, Page 269
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1710, Number 7
  • bd/op/sele/conf: CB, 11 Oct 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015