Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mychajlo Koltun, C.SS.R.

Bishop of Sokal-Zhovkva (Ukrainian), Ukraine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Mar 1949 Born
1975²25.7ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
8 Nov 198132.6Solemn VowsMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
21 Nov 198132.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
13 Dec 198132.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
20 Apr 199344.0AppointedBishop of Zboriv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
19 Sep 199344.4Ordained BishopBishop of Zboriv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
13 Nov 199647.6AppointedArchiepiscopal Exarch of Kyiv-Vyshhorod (Ukrainian), Ukraine
13 Nov 199647.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Casae in Pamphylia
7 Nov 199748.6AppointedBishop of Zboriv (Ukrainian), Ukraine
21 Jul 200051.3AppointedBishop of Sokal (Ukrainian), Ukraine

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Mychajlo Koltun (VIAF: 173770923)
Bishop Mychajlo Koltun C.SS.R. (born ) Bishop of Sokal-Zhovkva

EventPlace
Birth PlacePolonychi

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Sokal-Zhovkva (Ukrainian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • NAME: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 136, Number 12,172
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 161, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • prof/sole/c0: CB, 2 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 4 Nov 2017