Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archeparchy of Ivano-Frankivsk [Stanislaviv] (Ukrainian)

Stanislaopolitanus



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Volodymyr Viytyshyn, Archbishop
  • Yosafat Moschych, C.M.S.A.A., Auxiliary Bishop

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Eparchy of Ivano-Frankivsk [Stanisławów] (Ukrainian)
26 March 1885ErectedEparchy of Ivano-Frankivsk [Stanisławów] (Ukrainian) (erected)
20 April 1993Territory LostEparchy of Ivano-Frankivsk [Stanisławów] (Ukrainian) Eparchy of Kolomyia-Chernivtsi (Ukrainian) (erected)
Archeparchy of Ivano-Frankivsk [Stanislaviv] (Ukrainian)
21 November 2011ElevatedEparchy of Ivano-Frankivsk [Stanisławów] (Ukrainian) Archeparchy of Ivano-Frankivsk [Stanislaviv] (Ukrainian)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Eparchy of Ivano-Frankivsk [Stanisławów] (Ukrainian)
19431,000,0004954952,020445ap1991
1999615,024920,00066.9%321183391,8142893305ap2000
2000365,200829,50044.0%329193481,0494699340ap2001
2001613,385827,50074.1%348203681,66642101340ap2002
2002612,212825,81774.1%366243901,56944110340ap2003
2003610,633801,92676.1%376233991,5304397340ap2004
2004609,098799,87976.1%376163921,55345125360ap2005
2006607,169795,74776.3%417274441,36764124365ap2007
2009603,918792,27276.2%419324511,33945122371ap2010
Archeparchy of Ivano-Frankivsk [Stanislaviv] (Ukrainian)

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_d, v3.0.1, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 1 Nov 2014