Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bl. Simeon Lukach

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Ivano-Frankivsk [Stanisławów] (Ukrainian)

Titular See: (underground bishop)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jul 1893BornStarunia
Oct 1919³26.2Ordained PriestPriest of Ivano-Frankivsk [Stanisławów] (Ukrainian), Ukraine
Apr 1945³51.7Ordained BishopAuxiliary Bishop of Ivano-Frankivsk [Stanisławów] (Ukrainian), Ukraine
22 Aug 196471.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Ivano-Frankivsk [Stanisławów] (Ukrainian), Ukraine
27 Jun 2001Beatified

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bl. Simeon Lukach:
Bishop Bl. Simeon Lukach (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Ivano-Frankivsk [Stanisławów]

  • a priest for 44.8 years
  • a bishop for 19.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1945, Number 16
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 163, Number 13,959
  • op/opd: CB, 25 Feb 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 1 Mar 2015